Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/09/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/09/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/09/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/09/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/09/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/09/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/05/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/05/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/05/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/01/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/08/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/19/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/13/2006