Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 05/24/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/13/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/13/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/13/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/13/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/13/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/13/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/13/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/13/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/13/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/13/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/13/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/13/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/13/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/13/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/13/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/20/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/20/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/20/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/20/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/20/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/20/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/20/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/20/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/20/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/20/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/20/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/20/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/27/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/27/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/27/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/27/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/27/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/27/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/27/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/27/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/27/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/27/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/27/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/20/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/20/2006
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 07/20/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/20/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/20/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/20/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/20/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/20/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/20/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/20/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/20/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/20/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/20/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/20/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/20/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/20/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/20/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/20/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/20/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/20/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/20/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/20/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/20/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/20/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/28/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/28/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/28/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/12/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/12/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/12/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/12/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/19/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/19/2006
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/19/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/19/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/19/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/19/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/21/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/21/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/21/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/21/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/21/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/21/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/21/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/21/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/21/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/21/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/21/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/21/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/21/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/21/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/21/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/21/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/21/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/21/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/21/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/21/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/25/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/25/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/25/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/25/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/26/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/26/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/26/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/27/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/27/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/28/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/28/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/28/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/28/2006