Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/16/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/19/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/19/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/19/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/21/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/21/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/22/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/29/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/29/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/18/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/07/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/21/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/05/2006