Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/27/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/11/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/12/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/12/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/13/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/13/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/13/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/13/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/18/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/18/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/26/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/26/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/06/2006