There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Securing the Homeland Through Agency Reporting Enhancement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish procedures for the issuance by the Commissioner of Social Security of "no match" letters to employers, and for the notification of the Secretary of Homeland Security regarding such letters.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/25/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/25/2006Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/2006Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/15/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/15/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/21/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/10/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/06/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/25/2006 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5507.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5507. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/25/2006)

Securing the Homeland Through Agency Reporting Enhancement Act - Amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) with respect to any case in which the Social Security account number in the wage records of an employee provided by the employer to the Social Security Administration do not match relevant records otherwise maintained by the Administration.

Requires the Commissioner of Social Security, in such a case, to send a prompt written notice ("no match" letter): (1) informing the employer of the discrepancies; (2) requesting information that would assist the Commissioner in resolving the discrepancies; and (3) informing the employer that a copy of such notice is being forwarded to assist the Secretary of Homeland Security in the enforcement of applicable federal immigration laws relating to employment of individuals who are not authorized to work in the United States.

Requires the Commissioner to forward such a copy to the Secretary of Homeland Security, including the information in which discrepancies appear.