Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/19/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/19/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/19/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/21/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/21/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/21/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/21/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/21/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/22/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/22/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/22/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/22/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/26/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/26/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/26/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/28/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/28/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/29/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/29/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/10/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/10/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/10/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/10/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/19/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/19/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/20/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/20/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 07/20/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/25/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/25/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/25/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/25/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/25/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/25/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/28/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/06/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/06/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/14/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/14/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/14/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/14/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/14/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/20/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/20/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/20/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/25/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/26/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/27/2006
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/27/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/28/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/06/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/06/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/06/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/06/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/06/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 12/06/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/06/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 12/06/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/06/2006