There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Right to Life Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To implement equal protection under the 14th article of amendment to the Constitution for the right to life of each born and preborn human person.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/02/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
03/02/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/02/2005Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/02/2005Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E144)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/02/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (101)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/02/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/03/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/03/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/03/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/03/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/03/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/09/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/09/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/05/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/19/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/20/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/20/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/20/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/22/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/22/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 07/22/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/28/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/13/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/15/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/28/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/28/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/09/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/16/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 01/31/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/02/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/07/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/07/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/29/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/29/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/06/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/25/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 05/02/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/04/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/11/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 06/08/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/10/2006
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/20/2006
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/26/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/06/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 09/14/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/02/2005 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution03/02/2005 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.552.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.552. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/02/2005)

Right to Life Act - Declares that the right to life guaranteed by the Constitution is vested in each human being. Defines "human being" (and "human person") to encompass all stages of life, including but not limited to the moment of fertilization or cloning.