Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/02/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/03/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/03/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/03/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/03/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/03/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/09/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/09/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/05/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/19/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/20/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/20/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/20/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/22/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/22/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 07/22/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/28/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/13/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/15/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/28/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/28/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/09/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/16/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 01/31/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/02/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/07/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/07/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/29/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/29/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/06/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/25/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 05/02/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/04/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/11/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 06/08/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/10/2006
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/20/2006
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 07/26/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/06/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 09/14/2006