There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

VIP Act
Veterans Identity Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the Office of Veterans Identity Protection Claims to reimburse injured persons for injuries suffered as a result of the unauthorized use, disclosure, or dissemination of identifying information stolen from the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/25/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
06/21/2006Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/21/2006Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/26/2006Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1000)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/2006Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/2006Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (122)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 05/25/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 05/25/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 05/25/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/06/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/08/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/08/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/08/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/08/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/08/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/08/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/08/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/08/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/08/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/08/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/08/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/08/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/08/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/09/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/09/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/09/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/09/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/09/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/09/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/09/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/09/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/09/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/09/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/09/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/09/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/09/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/09/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/19/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/19/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/19/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/19/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/19/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/19/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/19/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/19/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/19/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/19/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/21/2006
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/21/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/21/2006
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/26/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/26/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/24/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/25/2006 Referred to
06/21/2006 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5520. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/25/2006)

Veterans Identity Protection Act or VIP Act - Establishes as an independent office in the executive branch the Office of Veterans Identity Protection Claims, headed by a Director, to receive, process, and pay claims for injuries suffered as a result of the unauthorized use, disclosure, or dissemination of identifying information stolen from the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA). Authorizes judicial review of claim determinations.