Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/13/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/20/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/28/2006