Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/09/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/09/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/09/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/09/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/09/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/09/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/12/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/14/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/15/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/15/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/20/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/13/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/17/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/17/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/17/2006