Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/09/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/22/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/22/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/27/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/29/2006