Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/06/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 06/06/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/07/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/15/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/19/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/17/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/28/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/06/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/19/2006