Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/07/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/15/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/19/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/20/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/21/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/26/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/28/2006