Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 02/08/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/09/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/09/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/09/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 02/15/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/15/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 02/15/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/15/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/02/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/02/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/02/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/03/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/08/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/08/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/16/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/05/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/05/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/19/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/19/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/21/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/26/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/27/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 04/27/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/27/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 04/28/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/28/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/03/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/03/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/04/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/10/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/17/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/18/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 05/24/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/09/2005