There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To designate the United States courthouse to be constructed in Greenville, South Carolina, as the "Carroll A. Campbell, Jr. United States Courthouse".

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Federal courthouse to be constructed in Greenville, South Carolina, as the "Carroll A. Campbell, Jr. Federal Courthouse".


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
10/12/2006Became Public Law No: 109-331. (TXT | PDF)
10/12/2006Signed by President.
10/04/2006Presented to President.
09/30/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 9/29/2006 S10802-10803)
09/27/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7624)
06/07/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/12/2006Became Public Law No: 109-331. (TXT | PDF)
10/12/2006Signed by President.
10/04/2006HousePresented to President.
10/02/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/30/2006SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 9/29/2006 S10802-10803)
09/28/2006SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/27/2006-9:47pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/27/2006-9:47pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/27/2006-9:47pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7624)
09/27/2006-9:43pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5546.
09/27/2006-9:43pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7624-7625)
09/27/2006-9:43pmHouseMr. Shuster moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/20/2006HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/20/2006HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/14/2006HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management
09/14/2006HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management
06/08/2006HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/07/2006HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
06/07/2006HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/07/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/07/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/07/2006 Referred to
09/20/2006 Markup by
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management06/08/2006 Referred to
09/14/2006 Markup by
09/14/2006 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.5546. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-331 (10/12/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on September 27, 2006. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the U.S. courthouse to be constructed in Greenville, South Carolina, building number SC0017ZZ, as the "Carroll A. Campbell, Jr. United States Courthouse."