Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/14/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/14/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/20/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/13/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/13/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/19/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/13/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 12/05/2006