Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/13/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/13/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/20/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/26/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/10/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/10/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/10/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/24/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/07/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/26/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/05/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/08/2006