Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/08/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/08/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/09/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/15/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/15/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/15/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/15/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/15/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/15/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/15/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/20/2006
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/20/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/22/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/22/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/27/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/28/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/28/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/13/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/24/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/24/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/24/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/24/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/24/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/24/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/27/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/27/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/27/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/27/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/27/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/27/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/28/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/28/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/28/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/07/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/14/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/14/2006
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/14/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/14/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/14/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/21/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/21/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/28/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/28/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/28/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/28/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/28/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/29/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/14/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/07/2006