Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/08/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/08/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/08/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/08/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/08/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/08/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/08/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/14/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/15/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/15/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/15/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/15/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/15/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/15/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/15/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/15/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/15/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/16/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/16/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/17/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/17/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/01/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/01/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/01/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/01/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/01/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/01/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/02/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/02/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/03/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/03/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/08/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/10/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/14/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/14/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/14/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/14/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/05/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/13/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/13/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/20/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 04/26/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/26/2005
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/03/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/10/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/10/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/18/2005