There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

State Criminal Alien Assistance Program Reauthorization Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to authorize appropriations for fiscal years 2005 through 2011 to carry out the State Criminal Alien Assistance Program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/02/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/02/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/02/2005Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/02/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/14/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/14/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/14/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/14/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/14/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/14/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 02/15/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 02/15/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/01/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/03/2005
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 05/26/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/21/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/19/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/19/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 07/20/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/20/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/21/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/21/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/25/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/08/2005

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/02/2005 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims03/02/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.557. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/02/2005)

State Criminal Alien Assistance Program Reauthorization Act of 2005 - Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to authorize specified appropriations through FY 2011 for the State Criminal Alien Assistance Program.