Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 06/09/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/09/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/15/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/25/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/26/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/07/2006