Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/10/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/10/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/10/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/10/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/15/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/15/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/17/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/02/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/02/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/02/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/02/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/02/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/02/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/03/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/03/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/08/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/15/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/15/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/05/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 04/05/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/05/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/05/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/05/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/06/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/12/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/20/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/26/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/26/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/26/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/26/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/03/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/03/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/03/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/03/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/03/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/03/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/05/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/05/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/10/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/10/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/10/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/16/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/16/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/17/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/18/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/18/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/24/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/25/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/26/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/07/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/09/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/09/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/09/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/09/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/09/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/21/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/29/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/29/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/30/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/30/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/11/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/11/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/19/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/06/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/06/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/06/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/21/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/22/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/18/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/20/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/26/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/06/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/06/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/06/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/08/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/31/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/08/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/25/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/22/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/23/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/24/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/06/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/28/2006