Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/12/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/13/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/13/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/13/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/13/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/13/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/13/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/13/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/13/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/14/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/14/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/14/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/14/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/14/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/14/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/14/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/14/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/14/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/14/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/14/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/14/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/14/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/14/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/14/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/14/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/14/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/14/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/14/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/14/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/14/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/14/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/14/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/14/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/14/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/14/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/15/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/15/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/15/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/15/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/15/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/15/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/15/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/15/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/15/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/15/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/16/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/16/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/16/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/19/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/19/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/19/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/19/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/19/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/21/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/21/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/21/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/21/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/21/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/22/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/22/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/27/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/27/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/27/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/27/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/27/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/27/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/27/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/27/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/27/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/27/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/27/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/27/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/27/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/27/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/27/2006
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/27/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/27/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/27/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/27/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/27/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/27/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/27/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/27/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/27/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/27/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/27/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/27/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/27/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/27/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/27/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/27/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/27/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/27/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/27/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/27/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/27/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/27/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/27/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/27/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/27/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/27/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/27/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/27/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/27/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/27/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/27/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/27/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/27/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/27/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/27/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/27/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/27/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/28/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/28/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/28/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 06/28/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/28/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/28/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/28/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/29/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/29/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/29/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/29/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/10/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/10/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/10/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/10/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/18/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/27/2006