Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/13/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 06/13/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/14/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/20/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/20/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/29/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/11/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/12/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/13/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/20/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/26/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/14/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/28/2006