Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
10/13/2006 Became Public Law No: 109-340.
10/13/2006 Signed by President.
10/02/2006 Presented to President.
09/29/2006 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10536)
04/20/2006 Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici under authority of the order of the Senate of 04/07/2006 without amendment. With written report No. 109-244.
11/16/2005 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10319-10320)
02/02/2005 Introduced in House