Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/20/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/21/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/21/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/22/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/28/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/28/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/28/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/28/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/28/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/28/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/10/2006