Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/09/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/06/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/21/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/12/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/21/2005