Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 06/21/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/21/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/21/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 06/21/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/21/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 06/21/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/21/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/27/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/27/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/27/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/27/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/27/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/27/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/10/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/19/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/28/2006