Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 06/21/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 06/21/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/21/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/21/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 06/21/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 06/21/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 06/21/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/27/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/28/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/28/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/27/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/27/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/27/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 12/06/2006