Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/02/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/17/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/17/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/03/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/20/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/14/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/19/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/26/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/17/2006