Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/22/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/22/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/22/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/22/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/22/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 06/22/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/29/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/29/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/29/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/29/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/29/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/11/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/12/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/19/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/20/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/20/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/24/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/25/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/25/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 07/28/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/28/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/06/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/14/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/14/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/14/2006
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/27/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/13/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/05/2006