Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/28/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/28/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/28/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/28/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/28/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/11/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/11/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/11/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/11/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/12/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/12/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/12/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/17/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/17/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/17/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/17/2006
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/17/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/18/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/18/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/18/2006
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 07/19/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/19/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/19/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/20/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/20/2006