Back to Actions

Bill History in the Congressional Record

Page numbers for legislative actions on this bill link to the Congressional Record. Learn more about the History of Bills and Resolutions.


From the Congressional Record, Volume 152 (2006)


[History of Bills, Volume 152 (2006)]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office, www.gpo.gov]


------------------------------------------------------
H.R. 5682--A bill to exempt from certain requirements of the Atomic 
    Energy Act of 1954 a proposed nuclear agreement for cooperation 
    with India; to the Committee on International Relations, and in 
    addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be 
    subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for 
    consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction 
    of the committee concerned.


By Mr. HYDE (for himself, Mr. Lantos, Ms. Ros-Lehtinen, Mr. Ackerman, 
Mr. Burton of Indiana, Mr. Wilson of South Carolina, Mr. Faleomavaega, 
Mr. Engel, Mr. Crowley, and Mr. Etheridge), H4554 [26JN]

  Cosponsors added, H4796 [28JN], H4918 [29JN], H5047 [11JY], H5128 
  [12JY], H5281 [17JY], H5380 [18JY], H5492 [19JY], H5567 [20JY]
  Reported with amendment from the Committee on International 
  Relations (H. Rept. 109-590, part 1) (filed July 21, 2006), H5682 
  [24JY]
  Provided for consideration (H. Res. 947), H5853 [25JY]
  Debated, H5902 [26JY]
  Text, H5915 [26JY]
  Amendments, H5918, H5919, H5920, H5922, H5923, H5924, H5925 [26JY]
  Passed House amended, H5930 [26JY]
  Message from the House, S8375 [27JY], S11322 [6DE], S11737 [8DE]
  Placed on the calendar, S8376 [27JY]
  Passed Senate amended (text of S. 3709 inserted in lieu), S11028 
  [16NO]
  Text, S11028 [16NO]
  Senate insisted on its amendment and asked for a conference. 
  Conferees appointed, S11034 [16NO]
  Conferees appointed, S11108 [4DE]
  House disagreed to Senate amendment and agreed to a conference. 
  Conferees appointed, H8701 [5DE]
  Conference report (H. Rept. 109-721) submitted in the House, H8934 
  [7DE]
  Explanatory statement, H8941 [7DE]
  Conference report considered in the House, H9146 [8DE]
  Conference report agreed to in the House, H9159 [8DE]
  Conference report agreed to in the Senate, S11822 [8DE]
  Message from the Senate (December 11, 2006), H9319 [27DE]
  Examined and signed in the House (December 12, 2006), H9320 [27DE]
  Message from the House (December 12, 2006), S11856 [27DE]
  Examined and signed in the Senate (December 12, 2006), S11856 [27DE]
  Presented to the President (December 13, 2006), H9322 [27DE]
  Approved [Public Law 109-401] (signed December 18, 2006)