There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To preserve the Mt. Soledad Veterans Memorial in San Diego, California, by providing for the immediate acquisition of the memorial by the United States.


Actions Overview (6)

Date Actions Overview
08/14/2006Became Public Law No: 109-272. (TXT | PDF)
08/14/2006Signed by President.
08/02/2006Presented to President.
08/01/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8550)
07/19/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 349 - 74, 3 Present (Roll no. 386).(text: CR H5422)
06/26/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/14/2006Became Public Law No: 109-272. (TXT | PDF)
08/14/2006Signed by President.
08/02/2006HousePresented to President.
08/02/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/2006SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8550)
07/20/2006SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
07/19/2006-4:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/19/2006-4:49pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 349 - 74, 3 Present (Roll no. 386). (text: CR H5422)
07/19/2006-4:41pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5433-5434)
07/19/2006-3:09pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/19/2006-2:35pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5683.
07/19/2006-2:35pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5422-5426)
07/19/2006-2:35pmHouseMr. Hunter moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/13/2006HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
06/29/2006HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
06/29/2006HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Resources
06/26/2006HouseReferred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/26/2006HouseReferred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/26/2006HouseReferred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/26/2006HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 06/26/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/26/2006

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Resources06/26/2006 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation, and Public Lands06/29/2006 Referred to
House Armed Services06/26/2006 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Readiness07/13/2006 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.5683. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-272 (08/14/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on July 19, 2006. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Vests in the United States all right, title, and interest to, and the right to immediate possession of, the Mt. Soledad Veterans Memorial in San Diego, California, to provide for its preservation as a national war memorial honoring veterans.

Requires the United States to pay just compensation to the current owner of such property.

Prohibits expanding the Memorial's boundaries, upon acquisition by the United States.