Text: H.R.5690 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-391 (12/12/2006)

 
[109th Congress Public Law 391]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


[DOCID: f:publ391.109]

[[Page 120 STAT. 2701]]

Public Law 109-391
109th Congress

                                 An Act


 
 To adjust the boundaries of the Ouachita National Forest in the States 
    of Oklahoma and Arkansas. <<NOTE: Dec. 12, 2006 -  [H.R. 5690]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress <<NOTE: Ouachita National Forest 
Boundary Adjustment Act of 2006.>> assembled,
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Ouachita National Forest Boundary 
Adjustment Act of 2006''.
SEC. 2. BOUNDARY ADJUSTMENT, OUACHITA NATIONAL FOREST, OKLAHOMA 
                    AND ARKANSAS.

    (a) Boundary Adjustment.--The boundaries of the Ouachita National 
Forest in the States of Oklahoma and Arkansas are hereby modified as 
generally depicted on the following maps, all dated May 15, 2001, and 
more particularly delineated and described according to the final 
boundary adjustment maps and boundary descriptions filed in the Office 
of the Chief of the Forest Service:
            (1) The map entitled ``Ouachita National Forest Boundary 
        Extension for the Broken Bow Area''.
            (2) The map entitled ``Ouachita National Forest Boundary 
        Extension for the Southern Tiak Area''.
            (3) The map entitled ``Ouachita National Forest Boundary 
        Extension for the Northern Ouachita Area''.
            (4) The map entitled ``Ouachita National Forest Boundary 
        Extension for the Southern Ouachita Area''.
            (5) The map entitled ``Ouachita National Forest Boundary 
        Extension for the Eastern Ouachita Area''.

    (b) Availability and Correction.--The maps referred to in subsection 
(a) shall be on file and available for public inspection in the Office 
of the Chief of the Forest Service. The Secretary of Agriculture may 
make minor corrections to the maps.
    (c) Management of Acquired Land.--Any federally-owned lands that 
have been or hereafter may be acquired for National Forest System 
purposes within the boundaries of the Ouachita National Forest, as 
modified by subsection (a), shall be managed as lands acquired under the 
Act of March 1, 1911 (commonly known as the Weeks Act), and in 
accordance with the other laws and regulations pertaining to the 
National Forest System. Nothing in this subsection shall limit the 
authority of the Secretary of Agriculture to adjust the boundaries of 
the Ouachita National Forest pursuant to section 11 of such Act (16 
U.S.C. 521).
    (d) Relation to Land and Water Conservation Fund Act.--For purposes 
of section 7 of the Land and Water Conservation Fund Act of 1965 (16 
U.S.C. 460l-9), the boundaries of the Ouachita

[[Page 120 STAT. 2702]]

National Forest, as modified by subsection (a), shall be considered to 
be boundaries of the Ouachita National Forest as of January 1, 1965.

    Approved December 12, 2006.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 5690:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 152 (2006):
            Sept. 27, considered and passed House.
            Nov. 16, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>