Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 06/28/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/28/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 06/28/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/28/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 06/28/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/28/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/10/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/10/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/10/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/12/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/12/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/12/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/17/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/17/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/17/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/17/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/18/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/20/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/20/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/24/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/26/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/26/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/27/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/27/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/27/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/27/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/28/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/06/2006
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/06/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/06/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/06/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/06/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/06/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/06/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/06/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/07/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/07/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/12/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/12/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/12/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/13/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/13/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/13/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/14/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/14/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/14/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/19/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/19/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/21/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/21/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/21/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/21/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/25/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/25/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/25/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 09/26/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/26/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 09/26/2006
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/28/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/28/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/28/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/28/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/29/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/29/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/14/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 11/14/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/14/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 11/14/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/14/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/14/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/14/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 11/14/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/15/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 12/05/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 12/05/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 12/05/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/05/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 12/05/2006