Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/10/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/11/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/13/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/17/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/19/2006