Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/28/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/24/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/13/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/14/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/19/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/13/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 12/08/2006