Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/29/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/13/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/13/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/13/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/13/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/17/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/17/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/17/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/19/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/19/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/19/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/19/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/19/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/24/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/24/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/27/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/27/2006