There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Children of Fallen Soldiers Pell Grant Act of 2006

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure Pell Grant eligibility for any student whose parent or guardian died as a result of performing military service in Iraq or Afghanistan after September 11, 2001.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/29/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/07/2006Referred to the Subcommittee on 21st Century Competitiveness.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
06/29/2006Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/29/2006Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/29/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/29/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/11/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/11/2006
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/11/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/11/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/11/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/12/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/12/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/12/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/12/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/12/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/13/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/13/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/13/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/19/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/19/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/19/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/19/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/19/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/19/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/19/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/19/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/26/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/26/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/26/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/26/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/13/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/13/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/13/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/20/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/20/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/26/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/26/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/26/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/14/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce06/29/2006 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on 21st Century Competitiveness09/07/2006 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5733.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5733. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/29/2006)

Children of Fallen Soldiers Pell Grant Act of 2006 - Amends the Higher Educaton Act of 1965 to eliminate the expected family contribution used in determining Pell Grant eligibility in the case of a student applicant whose parent or guardian was killed while performing military service in Iraq or Afghanistan after September 11, 2001.