Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/29/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/29/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/11/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/11/2006
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/11/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/11/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/11/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/12/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/12/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/12/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/12/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/12/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/13/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/13/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/13/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/19/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/19/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/19/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/19/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/19/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/19/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/19/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/19/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/26/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/26/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/26/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/26/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/13/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/13/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/13/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/20/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/20/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/26/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/26/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/26/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/14/2006