There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 101 Palafox Place in Pensacola, Florida, as the "Vincent J. Whibbs, Sr. Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/18/2006Became Public Law No: 109-402. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2006Signed by President.
12/11/2006Presented to President.
12/06/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/06/2006Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 12/7/2006 S11376)
09/28/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7889)
06/29/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
12/18/2006Became Public Law No: 109-402. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2006Signed by President.
12/11/2006HousePresented to President.
12/06/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/06/2006SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/06/2006SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 12/7/2006 S11376)
11/13/2006SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/29/2006SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/28/2006-11:16pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/28/2006-11:16pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7889)
09/28/2006-11:13pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5736.
09/28/2006-11:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7889-7890)
09/28/2006-11:12pmHouseMr. Marchant moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/29/2006HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
06/29/2006HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform06/29/2006 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs11/13/2006 Referred to
12/06/2006 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.5736.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.5736. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-402 (12/18/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 101 Palafox Place in Pensacola, Florida, as the "Vincent J. Whibbs, Sr. Post Office Building."