Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/29/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 06/29/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/29/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/29/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 06/29/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/29/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/29/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/10/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/10/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/10/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/10/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/13/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/07/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/29/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/29/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/05/2006