Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 06/29/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/12/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/12/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/26/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/12/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/13/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/14/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/19/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/21/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/27/2006