Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 06/29/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/13/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/18/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/07/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/14/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/14/2006
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 09/20/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/25/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/25/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/25/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/29/2006