Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/10/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/28/2006
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/28/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/28/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/28/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/28/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/28/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/07/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/07/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/07/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/07/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/07/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 09/07/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/07/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/07/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/07/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/07/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/13/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/13/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/13/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/13/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/13/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/14/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/19/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/19/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/19/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/19/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/19/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/19/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 09/20/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/26/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/26/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/26/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/26/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/26/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/26/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/26/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/27/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/27/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/28/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/29/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/29/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/29/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 09/29/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/29/2006
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/06/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/06/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/06/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/06/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/06/2006