There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Soldiers Targeted by Offensive Profiteering Act of 2006 (STOP Act)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, to direct the Secretary of Defense to prohibit the unauthorized use of names and images of members of the Armed Forces.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/11/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
08/10/2006Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
07/11/2006Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/11/2006Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (106)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/13/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/13/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/13/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/13/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/13/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/13/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/13/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/13/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/13/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/13/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 07/13/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/17/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/17/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/17/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/17/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/17/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/17/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/17/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/18/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/18/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/18/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/18/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/18/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/18/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/18/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/18/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/18/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/18/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/18/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/18/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/18/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/18/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/18/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/19/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/19/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/20/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/20/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/20/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/20/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/20/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/24/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/24/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/24/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/24/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 07/25/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/25/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/25/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/25/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/25/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/25/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/26/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/26/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/26/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/26/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/27/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/27/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/27/2006
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/27/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/27/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/27/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/27/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/28/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/28/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/28/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/06/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/07/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/14/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/19/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/21/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/25/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/25/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/25/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/27/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/28/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/15/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/05/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/05/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services07/11/2006 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel08/10/2006 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5755. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/11/2006)

Soldiers Targeted by Offensive Profiteering Act of 2006 (STOP Act) - Prohibits any person, except with permission, from using the name or image of a protected individual in connection with any merchandise, retail product, impersonation, solicitation, or commercial activity in a manner calculated to: (1) connect the protected individual with that individual's service in the Armed Forces; and (2) convey the impression that such use is approved, endorsed, or authorized by the protected individual. Defines as a "protected individual" any person who: (1) is a member of the Armed Forces; or (2) was a member at any time after April 5, 1917, and, if not living, has a surviving spouse, child, parent, grandparent, or sibling.

Authorizes the Attorney General to bring actions to enjoin violations of this Act.