Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/13/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/13/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/13/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/13/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/13/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/13/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/13/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/13/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/13/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/13/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 07/13/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/17/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/17/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/17/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/17/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/17/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/17/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/17/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/18/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/18/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/18/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/18/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/18/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/18/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/18/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/18/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/18/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/18/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/18/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/18/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/18/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/18/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/18/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/19/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/19/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/20/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/20/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/20/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/20/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/20/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/24/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/24/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/24/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/24/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 07/25/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/25/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/25/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/25/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/25/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/25/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/26/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/26/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/26/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/26/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/27/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/27/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/27/2006
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/27/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/27/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/27/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/27/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/28/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 07/28/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/28/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/06/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/07/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/14/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/19/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/21/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/25/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/25/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/25/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/27/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/28/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/15/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/05/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/05/2006