Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/13/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/13/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/13/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/13/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/13/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/13/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 07/17/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/17/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/17/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/17/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/19/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/19/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/20/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/20/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/24/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/24/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/26/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/26/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/28/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/06/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/06/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/06/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/06/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/07/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/12/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/14/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/19/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/20/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/27/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/13/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/13/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/05/2006